EP0731086 - Process for the preparation of aromatic nitriles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [1999/17] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1997/03] | For all designated states Ciba SC Holding AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kudschus, Martin, Dr. Route du Crochet 2 1762 Givisiez / CH | [1996/37] | Application number, filing date | 96810115.4 | 01.03.1996 | [1996/37] | Priority number, date | CH19950000687 | 09.03.1995 Original published format: CH 68795 | [1996/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0731086 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0731086 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C253/00, C07C255/49 | [1996/37] | CPC: |
C07C253/00 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C253/00, C07C255/50 (US,EP);
C07C253/00, C07C255/54 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1996/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung aromatischer Nitrile | [1996/37] | English: | Process for the preparation of aromatic nitriles | [1996/37] | French: | Procédé de préparation de nitriles aromatiques | [1996/37] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 03.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0550762 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0144885 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [DA]EP0609179 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *; | [DA]EP0080700 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPS4535771B | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 70, no. 45, Database accession no. 70-83813r, XP002004623 & JPS4535771B B1 00000000 (MITSUI PETROCHEM INDS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |