EP0742404 - Pipe clamp with elastic insert [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carbonare, Martin Sebleweg 4 6840 Götzis / AT | [1996/46] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 96810153.5 | 13.03.1996 | [1996/46] | Priority number, date | DE19951016202 | 08.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19516202 | [1996/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742404 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/033 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
F16L55/035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, LI [1996/46] | Title | German: | Rohrschelle mit elastischer Einlage | [1996/46] | English: | Pipe clamp with elastic insert | [1996/46] | French: | Collier de serrage avec chemise élastique | [1996/46] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 27.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/36] | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE4029090 (HILTI AG) [DY] 1,2 * abstract * * claims 1-3 * * figures 2,3 *; | [YA]DE7426865U (PFITZMANN, WOLFGANG) [Y] 1,2 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 2 * * claims 1,4,5 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 4; | [A]GB592755 (ADEL PRECISION PRODUCTS CORP.) [A] 1,2,4 * page 1, line 11 - line 21 * * page 2, line 72 - line 85 * * figures 2,3,5,6,12,20 *; | [A]DE1861779U (SORGE, HANS) [A] 1,2 * claims 4,5 * * figures 1,3 * |