blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0754635

EP0754635 - Double-walled tank and method of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.03.2001 [2001/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Adisa Service und Entwicklungs AG
Steinackerstrasse 40
8902 Urdorf / CH
[1997/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Bachmann, Werner
Steinhügelstrasse 17
8965 Berikon 1 / CH
[1997/04]
Representative(s)Riederer, Conrad A.
c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 Postfach
7310 Bad Ragaz / CH
[N/P]
Former [1997/04]Riederer, Conrad A., Dr.
Bahnhofstrasse 10
7310 Bad Ragaz / CH
Application number, filing date96810450.512.07.1996
[1997/04]
Priority number, dateCH1995000210117.07.1995         Original published format: CH 210195
[1997/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0754635
Date:22.01.1997
Language:DE
[1997/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.1996
ClassificationIPC:B65D90/02
[1997/04]
CPC data not yet available
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT [1997/04]
Extension statesSI15.07.1996
TitleGerman:Doppelwandiger Tank und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[1997/04]
English:Double-walled tank and method of making the same[1997/04]
French:Réservoir à double paroi et son procédé de fabrication[1997/04]
Examination procedure21.10.1996Examination requested  [1997/04]
25.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/10]
09.10.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.08.1996FR   M02   Fee paid on   14.09.1996
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200005   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3509016  (UNDERWOOD THEODORE A, et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2658088  (TANK UND APPARATEBAU W ERMERT) [A] 1,6-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4339506  (MARTIN JR THEODORE O) [A] 1* the whole document *;
 [YDA]US4844287  (LONG DELMAR D [US]) [YD] 1,11 * the whole document * [A] 2-5;
 [YDA]US5000342  (SHARP BRUCE R [US]) [YD] 1,11 * the whole document * [A] 6-8,15,16
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.