EP0755848 - Connection for built-up structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alusuisse Technology & Management AG Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [1997/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ritzl, Antal Albisriederstr. 363 8047 Zürich / CH | [1997/05] | Application number, filing date | 96810453.9 | 12.07.1996 | [1997/05] | Priority number, date | CH19950002173 | 24.07.1995 Original published format: CH 217395 | [1997/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755848 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755848 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/04 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
B62D33/04 (EP);
B62D33/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/05] | Title | German: | Baugruppenverbindung | [1997/05] | English: | Connection for built-up structures | [1997/05] | French: | Connection de structures assemblées | [1997/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 22.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]AT293197B (ERBSLÖH) [Y] 1-3,5 * page 2, line 11 - line 16; figure 4 *; | [Y]GB2220724 (HULLS JOHN R) [Y] 1-3,5 * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 21; figure 3 *; | [Y]FR2237463 (GROSSE GERARD) [Y] 1-3 * page 3, line 15 - line 23; figure 3 *; | [Y]FR1424185 (DAUSEND) [Y] 1-3 * page 1, column R, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [A]CH452365 (ALUMINIUM PRESS- UND WALZWERK MÜNCHENSTEIN) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]US3061364 (FRUEHAUF) [A] 1 * page 1, line 66 - page 2, line 14; figure 2 *; | [A]US5403063 (SJOSTEDT ROBBIE J ET AL) [A] 1,2,5 * page 14, line 42 - page 15, line 27; figure 11 * |