EP0763490 - Method for controlling the completeness of a book or a stack of sheets to be bound by glue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRAPHA-HOLDING AG Seestrasse 41, Postfach 170 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states GRAPHA-HOLDING AG Seestrasse 41, Postfach 170 6052 Hergiswil / CH | ||
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states GRAPHA-HOLDING AG Seestrasse 41 CH-6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geiser, Peter Austrasse 37 9548 Matzingen / CH | [1997/12] | Application number, filing date | 96810595.7 | 09.09.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | CH19950002588 | 13.09.1995 Original published format: CH 258895 | [1997/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763490 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0763490 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65H7/02, B42C19/00 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
B42C19/00 (EP,US);
B65H7/02 (EP,US);
B65H2511/13 (EP,US);
B65H2515/34 (EP,US);
B65H2553/81 (EP,US);
Y10S412/901 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/13, B65H2220/03 (EP,US);
B65H2515/34, B65H2220/01 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Prüfung der Vollständigkeit eines zur Klebebindung bestimmten Buchblockes oder Buches | [1997/12] | English: | Method for controlling the completeness of a book or a stack of sheets to be bound by glue | [1997/12] | French: | Procédé pour contrôler l'état complet d'un livre ou d'un bloc de feuilles destinés à être reliés par collage | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 08.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 07.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0337291 (BOURG C P SA [FR]) [A] 1,3,4,6,8,9 * column 3, line 26 - column 7, line 40; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3622147 (MEBUS HENRY R) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 30 - line 42; figure 2 *; | [A]DE3613120 (KOLBUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |