EP0778100 - Percussion twist drill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleine, Werner An der Marsch 29 28832 Achim / DE | 02 /
Bongers, Werner Minorstrasse 2 81477 München / DE | 03 /
Neukirchen, Axel Goethestrasse 2 48327 Drensteinfurt / DE | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland, et al Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Wildi, Roland, et al Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 96810630.2 | 25.09.1996 | [1997/24] | Priority number, date | DE19951045647 | 07.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19545647 | [1997/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0778100 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0778100 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/02, E21B10/44 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
E21B10/58 (EP,US);
E21B10/445 (EP,US);
Y10T408/906 (EP,US);
Y10T408/9065 (EP,US);
Y10T408/909 (EP,US);
Y10T408/9097 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1997/24] | Title | German: | Drehschlag-Wendelbohrer | [1997/24] | English: | Percussion twist drill | [1997/24] | French: | Foret héliocoidal de percussion | [1997/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/06] | 12.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3447616 (GRANAT ZIGMUND E) [X] 1-3,5 * column 2, line 22 - line 44; figures 3-5 * [Y] 4; | [Y]US4314616 (RAUCKHORST JAMES E, et al) [Y] 4* figure 4 *; | [X]US5287937 (SOLLAMI PHILLIP A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * siehe Referenzzeichen 29 und 30 im Text;; figure 2 * |