EP0776689 - Mixing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM (Schweiz) AG Haselstrasse 16 5401 Baden / CH | [2001/42] |
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states ABB ALSTOM POWER (Schweiz) AG 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states ABB RESEARCH LTD. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eroglu, Adnan, Dr. Irisweg 7 5217 Untersiggenthal / CH | 02 /
Polifke, Wolfgang, Dr. Ländestrasse 4 5200 Windisch / CH | 03 /
Senior, Peter, Dr. 8 Marston Crescent, Countesthorpe Leicester LE8 5PY / GB | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2001/47] |
Former [2000/26] | Rösler, Uwe, Dipl.-Phys., et al Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei, Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/23] | Weibel, Beat, et al c/o Asea Brown Boveri AG, Intellectual Property Department (TEI), Bldg. 699/1st Floor, P.O. Box 5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 96810767.2 | 11.11.1996 | [1997/23] | Priority number, date | DE1995144816 | 01.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19544816 | [1997/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0776689 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776689 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/06, F23R3/20 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
B01F25/421 (EP,US);
B01F25/43172 (EP,US);
B01F25/431971 (EP,US);
F05B2260/222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/23] | Title | German: | Mischvorrichtung | [1997/23] | English: | Mixing device | [1997/23] | French: | Dispositif de mélange | [1997/23] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 21.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.01.1997 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   30.01.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 05.09.2001 | [2003/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4164375 (ALLEN DAVID J [GB]) [A] 1 * figures 1-8; claim 6 *; | [DA]EP0619134 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0620403 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [A] 1 * figures 1-7; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0623786 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6,16,17; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0619134 |