EP0790025 - Clothes hanger and apparatus for its manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Owo Kunststoffwerke AG Balsthalerstrasse 1 4717 Mümliswil / CH | [1997/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boner, Rudolf Mattenweg 736 4717 Mümliswil / CH | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Kulhavy, Sava, et al MOETTELI & Associés SARL St. Leonhardstrasse 4 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Kulhavy, Sava, et al MOETTELI & Associés SARL St. Leonhardstrasse 4 9000 St. Gallen / CH | ||
Former [1997/34] | Kulhavy, Sava, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Sava V. Kulhavy, Kornhausstrasse 3, Postfach 1138 9001 St. Gallen / CH | Application number, filing date | 96810908.2 | 24.12.1996 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | CH19960000434 | 19.02.1996 Original published format: CH 43496 | [1997/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0790025 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0790025 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A47G25/32 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
A47G25/32 (EP);
A47G25/743 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [1997/34] | Title | German: | Kleiderbügel und Einrichtung zur Herstellung desselben | [1997/34] | English: | Clothes hanger and apparatus for its manufacturing | [1997/34] | French: | Cintre pour vêtements et dispositif pour sa fabrication | [1997/34] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/12] | 22.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.08.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]AU7824981 (FISCHER ENG CO PTY LTD) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 14; figures 1-3 * [A] 6; | [X]US3319850 (ROSEN JACK R) [X] 1 * column 1, line 40 - line 47 *; | [X]US3963154 (SCHWARTZ MICHEL S, et al) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [A]GB2233888 (NAPTHINE RICHARD DAVID [GB], et al) [A] 11 * page 5, paragraph 3 * |