EP0729053 - Device for projecting a flat beam of diverging laser rays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICRO ITALIANA S.p.A. Viale Vicenza, 40 I-36071 Arzignano (Vicenza) / IT | [1996/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doriguzzi Bozzo, Mario c/o Micro Italiana S.p.A., Viale Vicenza, 40 36071 Arzignano / IT | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96830075.6 | 21.02.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | IT1995MI00330 | 22.02.1995 Original published format: IT MI950330 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0729053 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0729053 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/09, G01C15/00 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
G01C15/004 (EP,US);
Y10S33/21 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [1996/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Projektion eines flachen divergierenden Laserstrahles | [1996/35] | English: | Device for projecting a flat beam of diverging laser rays | [1996/35] | French: | Dispositif pour la projection d'un faisceau plan de rayons laser divergents | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/28] | 16.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.12.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4105339 (WIRTANEN THEODORE E) [A] 12 * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0102221 (OZAKI YASUTO) [Y] 1-11,13,15,21 * page 2, line 9 - page 2, line 10; figure 1 * * page 2, line 21 - page 2, line 32 * * page 4, line 8 - page 4, line 11 *; | [A]US5144487 (HERSEY WILLIAM H [US]); | [YA]EP0619470 (MICRO ITALIANA SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-11,13,15,21 * column 2, line 3 - column 2, line 3; figure 1 * * column 2, line 22 - column 2, line 32 * * column 2, line 36 - column 2, line 44 * * column 3, line 34 - column 3, line 38 * * column 3, line 53 - column 3, line 55 * * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 25 * [A] 10,14-20 |