EP0848332 - Unit for arbitration of access to a bus of a multiprocessor system with retry ability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BULL S.A. 68, route de Versailles 78434 Louveciennes Cedex / FR | [1999/49] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states BULL HN INFORMATION SYSTEMS ITALIA S.p.A. Via Martiri d'Italia 3 10014 Caluso (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zulian, Ferruccio Via G. B. Vico, 12 20010 Cornaredo, Milano / IT | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1998/25] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96830621.7 | 13.12.1996 | [1998/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848332 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848332 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/364 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
G06F13/364 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/09] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Arbitrierungseinheit zum Multiprozessorsystembuszugriff mit Wiederholungsfähigkeit | [1998/25] | English: | Unit for arbitration of access to a bus of a multiprocessor system with retry ability | [1998/25] | French: | Unité d'arbitrage d'accès à un bus de système multiprocesseur avec capacité de répétition | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 05.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0665501 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,7 * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 6 * * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 26 * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO9635175 (APPLE COMPUTER [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 1 - line 12 * * page 10, line 35 - page 11, line 28 * |