EP0752381 - Device for monitoring the movement of the loading/unloading belt of a transportation carriage, especially for sorting apparatuses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Canziani, Francesco Via C. Ferrini, 23 Samarate, Varese / IT | 02 /
Soldavini, Attilio Via 5 Martiri no. 36 21010 Ferno-VA / IT | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | Taquist, Lennart, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE | Application number, filing date | 96850122.1 | 26.06.1996 | [1997/02] | Priority number, date | IT1995MI01426 | 04.07.1995 Original published format: IT MI951426 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752381 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752381 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/34, B65G43/08 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
G01P3/487 (EP,US);
B65G17/345 (EP,US);
B65G43/00 (EP,US);
B65G2201/02 (EP,US);
B65G2207/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/02] | Title | German: | Überwachungseinrichtung für die Bewegung des Be- und Entladebandes eines Transportwagens, insbesondere für Sortiereinrichtungen | [1997/02] | English: | Device for monitoring the movement of the loading/unloading belt of a transportation carriage, especially for sorting apparatuses | [1997/02] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance pour le mouvement d'une bande de chargement/déchargement d'un chariot de transport, notamment pour appareils de triage | [1997/02] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 15.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03] | Request for further processing for: | 29.12.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 29.12.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.02.2000 | BE | 02.02.2000 | CH | 02.02.2000 | ES | 02.02.2000 | FI | 02.02.2000 | GR | 02.02.2000 | IT | 02.02.2000 | LI | 02.02.2000 | PT | 02.05.2000 | SE | 02.05.2000 | IE | 26.06.2000 | LU | 26.06.2000 | MC | 30.06.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
ES | 02.02.2000 | ||
FI | 02.02.2000 | ||
GR | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
PT | 02.05.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
IE | 26.06.2000 | ||
LU | 26.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
ES | 02.02.2000 | ||
FI | 02.02.2000 | ||
GR | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
PT | 02.05.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
IE | 26.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
ES | 02.02.2000 | ||
FI | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
PT | 02.05.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
IE | 26.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
ES | 02.02.2000 | ||
FI | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
PT | 02.05.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
IE | 26.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
FI | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
PT | 02.05.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
IE | 26.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
FI | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
PT | 02.05.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
PT | 02.05.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 02.02.2000 | |
BE | 02.02.2000 | ||
CH | 02.02.2000 | ||
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 02.02.2000 | |
LI | 02.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 08.05.2000 | |
LI | 08.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3756370 (INGRAM C) [A] 1,11* column 4, line 3 - line 37; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]EP0343612 (CANZIANI FRANCESCO) [DA] 1-4,11-14 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 13; figure 1 *; | [PX]EP0700844 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [PX] 1-8,11-18 * page 4, line 4 - line 16 * * page 8, line 58 - page 9, line 39; figures 1-3,17A-23 * |