EP0762346 - Coin mechanism with magnetic coin discriminator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Machine-O-Matic Limited 1341 Kerrisdale Boulevard Newmarket Ontario L3Y 7V1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states Machine-O-Matic Limited 1341 Kerrisdale Boulevard Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 7V1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarzli, Josef W. 3927 Vandorf Road Stouffville, Ontario L4A 7X5 / CA | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Modrie, Guy, et al NOVAMARK & VIGNERON, Boulevard du Souverain 7 1170 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | Modrie, Guy, et al Novamark & Vigneron, Boulevard du Souverain 7 1170 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1997/11] | Modrie, Guy, et al Cabinet Vigneron Avenue G. De Longueville, 22 Bte 7-14 1150 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 96870111.0 | 22.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | CA19952156787 | 23.08.1995 Original published format: CA 2156787 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0762346 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0762346 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G07F3/02, G07D5/08 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
G07D5/02 (EP,US);
G07D5/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/11] | G07F3/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, PT [1997/11] | Title | German: | Münzmechanismus mit magnetischem Münzprüfer | [1997/11] | English: | Coin mechanism with magnetic coin discriminator | [1997/11] | French: | Mécanisme pour pièces de monnaie avec un discriminateur magnétique de pièces de monnaie | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/38] | 06.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.01.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4553657 (KILMARTIN DAVID F [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,8; claim 1 *; | [A]US5361886 (THOMAS HARTMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,7; claim 1 *; | [AD]US5383545 (SCHWARZLI JOSEF W [CA]) [AD] 1-20 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5404986 (HOSSFIELD ROBIN C [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4544058 (CHODERKER NATHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 3A; claim 1 * |