EP0728848 - Base for bell type furnaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ebner, Peter Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Bergham 168 4060 Leonding / AT | For all designated states Lochner, Heribert, Dipl.-Ing. Burgwallstrasse 19 4060 Leonding / AT | [1996/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Gerhard, et al Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7 4021 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Hübscher, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7 4021 Linz / AT | ||
Former [1996/35] | Hübscher, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher, Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 96890024.1 | 22.02.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | AT19950000337 | 24.02.1995 Original published format: AT 33795 | [1996/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0728848 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0728848 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0728848 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/673 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
C21D9/673 (EP,US);
F27B1/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/35] | Title | German: | Glühsockel für Haubenglühöfen | [1996/35] | English: | Base for bell type furnaces | [1996/35] | French: | Embase pour four à cloche | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 26.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1204246 (LEE WILSON); | [A]US4846675 (SOLIMAN MOHAMED M [US]); | [A]US4813654 (SINGLER JOHN E [US]); | [A]US2504809 (DAILEY JR WILLIAM H); | [A]GB1259726 (BETHLEHEM STEEL CORP [US]) |