EP0756059 - Solid wood section member for door frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tilly Holzindustrie GesmbH Krappfeldstrasse 27 9330 Treibach / AT | [1997/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Matschnig, Franz Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Siebensterngasse 54 1071 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | Matschnig, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Siebensterngasse 54 1071 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 96890115.7 | 01.07.1996 | [1997/05] | Priority number, date | AT19950001297 | 28.07.1995 Original published format: AT 129795 | [1997/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0756059 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0756059 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/74, E06B3/10 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
E06B3/10 (EP);
E06B3/74 (EP);
E06B2003/7067 (EP);
E06B2003/7071 (EP);
E06B2003/7086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1997/05] | Title | German: | Massivholzstange für ein Türfries | [1997/05] | English: | Solid wood section member for door frame | [1997/05] | French: | Profilé en bois massif pour cadre de porte | [1997/05] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 10.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4716700 (HAGEMEYER) [A] 1 * column 4, line 6 - line 68; figures 6-9 *; | [A]DE9400005U (DISL) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3687773 (WANGBORG) [A] 1 * column 1, line 59 - column 3, line 23; figure - *; | [A]GB553622 (BACHTOLD-ACHESON) [A] 1 * page 1, line 9 - line 53 * * page 3, line 77 - page 4, line 16 * * page 4, line 73 - page 5, line 39 * * figure - *; | [A]FR2469279 (DEGUT) [A] 1 * page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 31; figure - *; | [A]FR2289691 (LUTERMA) [A] 1,7,8 * page 2, line 6 - line 15 * * page 3, line 2 - line 40 * * figure - * |