EP0832302 - CHLORIDE ASSISTED HYDROMETALLURGICAL EXTRACTION OF NICKEL AND COBALT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/14] | CHLORIDE ASSISTED HYDROMETALLURGICAL EXTRACTION OF METAL | ||
[1999/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMINCO ENGINEERING SERVICES LTD. 200 Burrard Street, Suite 500 Vancouver British Columbia V6C 3L7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states COMINCO ENGINEERING SERVICES LTD. 200 Burrard Street, Suite 500 Vancouver, British Columbia V6C 3L7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, David, L. 1028 - 51A Street Delta, British Columbia V4M 2X8 / CA | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Gilding, Martin John Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Gilding, Martin John Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96900023.1 | 04.01.1996 | [1998/14] | WO1996CA00003 | Priority number, date | US19950488128 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 488128 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641026 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0832302 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832302 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C22B3/42, C22B3/08, // (C22B15/00, 19:00, 23:00) | [1998/14] | CPC: |
C22B3/10 (EP,US);
C22B3/42 (EP,KR,US);
C22B11/00 (EP,US);
C22B15/0067 (EP,US);
C22B15/0069 (EP,US);
C22B15/0071 (EP,US);
C22B15/0084 (EP,US);
C22B15/0089 (EP,US);
C22B19/22 (EP,US);
C22B19/26 (EP,US);
C22B23/0415 (EP,US);
C22B23/0423 (EP,US);
C22B23/043 (EP,US);
C22B23/0453 (EP,US);
C22B3/06 (EP,US);
C22B3/08 (EP,KR,US);
C22B3/20 (EP,US);
C22B3/26 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/14] | Title | German: | CHLORIDUNTERSTÜTZTE HYDROMETALLURGISCHE EXTRAKTION VON NICKEL UND KOBALT | [1999/40] | English: | CHLORIDE ASSISTED HYDROMETALLURGICAL EXTRACTION OF NICKEL AND COBALT | [1999/40] | French: | EXTRACTION HYDROMETALLURGIQUE DE NICKEL ET COBALT A L'AIDE DE CHLORURE | [1999/40] |
Former [1998/14] | CHLORIDUNTERSTÜTZTE HYDROMETALLURGISCHE METALLEXTRAKTION | ||
Former [1998/14] | CHLORIDE ASSISTED HYDROMETALLURGICAL EXTRACTION OF METAL | ||
Former [1998/14] | EXTRACTION HYDROMETALLURGIQUE DE METAL A L'AIDE DE CHLORURE | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 28.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 04.01.2001 | GB | 04.01.2001 | ES | 05.01.2001 | SE | 05.01.2001 | [2004/28] |
Former [2003/46] | DK | 04.01.2001 | |
GB | 04.01.2001 | ||
SE | 05.01.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | GB | 04.01.2001 | |
SE | 05.01.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 05.01.2001 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3761566 (MICHAL E) [Y] 1,2,8-14,16,17 * example -; claim - *; | [YD]US4039406 (STANLEY ROBERT W, et al) [YD] 1,2,8-14,16,17 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US4093526 (BLANCO JORGE L, et al) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US4108639 (LAKE MALCOLM JOHN, et al); | [AD]US4338168 (STANLEY ROBERT W, et al) [AD] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [A] - DUTRIZAC J E, "SULPHATE CONTROL IN CHLORIDE LEACHING PROCESSES", HYDROMETALLURGY, (19891001), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 1 - 22, XP000084129 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-386X(89)90014-5 | Examination | US4971662 | WO9619593 |