EP0802762 - DUST SEPARATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOTETRY LIMITED Kingsmead Mill Little Somerford Wiltshire SN15 5JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states NOTETRY LIMITED Kingsmead Mill Little Somerford, Wiltshire SN15 5JN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DYSON, James Kingsmead Mill Little Somerford, Wiltshire SN15 5JN / GB | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | Smith, Gillian Ruth Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | Smith, Gillian Ruth MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96900117.1 | 08.01.1996 | [1997/44] | WO1996GB00022 | Priority number, date | GB19950000424 | 10.01.1995 Original published format: GB 9500424 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9621389 | Date: | 18.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0802762 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0802762 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/16 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
A47L9/165 (EP,US);
A47L9/16 (KR);
A47L9/1633 (EP,US);
B04C5/02 (EP,US);
B04C5/04 (EP,US);
B04C5/081 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/44] | Title | German: | STAUBTRENNUNGSAPPARAT | [1997/44] | English: | DUST SEPARATION APPARATUS | [1997/44] | French: | APPAREIL SEPARATEUR DE POUSSIERES | [1997/44] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 04.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4443910 (FITZWATER EDWIN [US]) [Y] 6 * figures 2-4 *; | [A]US5062870 (DYSON JAMES [GB]) [A] 1* column W *; | [XYA]EP0489565 (NOTETRY LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,7,9-11 * column 3, lines 6-38 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 9 * * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 6 * * column 12, lines 46-53 * * column 9, lines 27-33 * [Y] 6 [A] 5,8 |