blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0805696

EP0805696 - AN INHALER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.02.2001 [2001/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Direct-Haler A/S
Alokken 44
5250 Odense SV / DK
[1997/46]
Inventor(s)01 / KELDMANN, Erik
Alokken 44
DK-5250 Odense SV / DK
02 / REIPUR, John
Fabritius Allé 17
DK-2930 Klampenborg / DK
[2000/11]
Former [1997/46]01 / KELDMANN, Erik
l kken 44
DK-5250 Odense SV / DK
02 / REIPUR, John
Fabritius Allé 17
DK-2930 Klampenborg / DK
Representative(s)Siiger, Joergen
c/o Chas. Hude
H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33
1553 Copenhagen V / DK
[N/P]
Former [1999/42]Siiger, Joergen
c/o Chas. Hude H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33
1553 Copenhagen V / DK
Former [1997/46]Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners A/S
Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007
1021 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date96900294.822.01.1996
[1997/46]
WO1996DK00034
Priority number, dateDK1995000008223.01.1995         Original published format: DK 8295
[1997/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9622802
Date:01.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0805696
Date:12.11.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0805696
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE01.08.1996
ClassificationIPC:A61M15/00
[1997/46]
CPC:
A61M15/0028 (EP); A61M15/00 (KR); A61M15/0045 (EP);
A61M16/0493 (EP); A61M2202/064 (EP); A61M2205/6081 (EP);
A61M2210/0625 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/46]
TitleGerman:INHALATOR[1997/46]
English:AN INHALER[1997/46]
French:INHALATEUR[1997/46]
Entry into regional phase25.08.1997National basic fee paid 
25.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/46]
14.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
10.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.1999Fee for grant paid
09.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
06.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US2503732  (HEISTERKAMP CHARLES A);
 [Y]US4148308  (SAYER WILLIAM J);
 [X]US4265236  (PACELLA ANGELO M);
 [X]WO8901348  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]);
 [X]EP0404454  (FISONS PLC [GB]);
 [X]WO9317728  (ASTRA AB [SE]);
 [X]WO9405358  (MEDIX LTD [GB], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.