EP0742863 - SCREW FASTENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOPPE AG Am Plausdorfer Tor 13 35260 Stadtallendorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states HOPPE AG Am Plausdorfer Tor 13 D-35260 Stadtallendorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REITZ, Reinhold Brunnenweg 15 34628 Merzhausen / DE | 02 /
OCHS, Günter Im Allendorfer Grund 4a 35260 Stadtallendorf / DE | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Olbricht, Karl Heinrich Patentanwalt Karl Olbricht, Postfach 11 43, Am Weinberg 15 35095 Weimar/Lahn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Olbricht, Karl Heinrich, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Karl Olbricht, Postfach 11 43, Am Weinberg 15 35095 Weimar/Lahn / DE | Application number, filing date | 96900314.4 | 11.01.1996 | [1996/47] | WO1996EP00095 | Priority number, date | DE19952000691U | 18.01.1995 Original published format: DE 29500691 U | [1996/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9622436 | Date: | 25.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742863 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742863 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E05B1/00, F16B13/08, F16B13/06 | [1996/47] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/47] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT MIT SCHRAUBENGEWINDE | [1996/47] | English: | SCREW FASTENER | [1996/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION A VIS | [1996/47] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1998/11: (deleted) | EPB 1998/11: (deleted) | EPB 1998/11: (deleted) | EPB 1997/23: Teilanmeldung 97104746.9 eingereicht am 20/03/97 | EPB 1997/23: Divisional application 97104746.9 filed on 20/03/97 | EPB 1997/23: Demande divisionnaire 97104746.9 déposée le 20/03/97 | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 24.07.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97104746.9 / EP0785320 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]DE1039880 (EIGEMEIER K G LEICHTMETALLGIES, et al) [X] 1,6,15,18 * column 3, line 20 - column 6, line 15 * * figure - * [A] 9 [Y] 12-14,17-20; | [XY]FR2612577 (GIESSE SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,4,5,15,18 * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 30; figure - * [Y] 7-9; | [XAY]GB2203641 (CELMAC LTD) [X] 1-3,10,16 * page 6, line 9 - page 10, line 8 * * figure - * [A] 5,6,9,15 [Y] 12-14,17-20; | [XAY]FR2616832 (GIESSE SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,15,18 * page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 20 * * figure - * [A] 5 [Y] 7; | [XAY]US4912809 (SCHEUER NICHOLAS G [US]) [X] 1,6 * column 2, line 67 - column 6, line 46; figure - * [A] 4,12,13 [Y] 8,9; | [A]DE9205735U (NIEMANN) [A] 1,8,9,11* page 4, line 31 - page 6, line 21; figure - *; | [XA]FR2680551 (SOFISEB SA [FR]) [X] 1,6,10 * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 14; figure - * [A] 4,9,13; | [XA]EP0563568 (HOPPE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * column 4, line 1 - line 57; figures 1-3,5 * [A] 5,8,9 |