EP0877969 - ELECTRO-OPTICAL FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Butcher, Roland 102 Colin Street West Perth, W.A. 6005 / AU | [1998/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Somervell, Thomas Richard, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Somervell, Thomas Richard, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [1998/47] | Carpenter, David MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 96900476.1 | 18.01.1996 | [1998/47] | WO1996AU00023 | Priority number, date | AU1995PN00613 | 18.01.1995 Original published format: AU PN061395 | AU1995PN03165 | 25.05.1995 Original published format: AU PN316595 | AU1995PN06182 | 26.10.1995 Original published format: AU PN618295 | [1998/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9622559 | Date: | 25.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0877969 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0877969 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.07.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13, G02F1/133, G02F1/03, H04N5/238 | [2001/23] | CPC: |
G02F1/13306 (EP,US);
G02F1/1354 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/47] | G02F1/13, G02F1/133, G02F1/03 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/47] | Title | German: | ELEKTROOPTISCHES FILTER | [1998/47] | English: | ELECTRO-OPTICAL FILTER | [1998/47] | French: | FILTRE ELECTRO-OPTIQUE | [1998/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.1997 | Search fee paid | 18.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 18.08.1997 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 12.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 04.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 31.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 31.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.04.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.1998 | 31.01.2003 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 18.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | [2011/29] |
Former [2010/05] | MC | 31.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1589972 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [A]US4620322 (EGGENSCHWILER ANDRE M [CH], et al) | International search | [A]JPS6333969 ; | [X]US4480269 (YOSHIDA NOBUAKI [JP], et al); | [X]US4976536 (VOGELEY JAMES H [US], et al); | [X]GB2255465 (SONY BROADCAST & COMMUNICATION [GB]); |