EP0817742 - DEVICE FOR PARKING TWO-WHEELED VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOBERG, Elmar Am Kapellenufer 121 D-44289 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
STUDTRUCKER, Rainer Wolfgang-Reuter 8 D-58300 Wetter / DE | [1998/03] | Application number, filing date | 96900875.4 | 25.01.1996 | [1998/03] | WO1996DE00136 | Priority number, date | DE19951002394 | 26.01.1995 Original published format: DE 19502394 | DE19951012910 | 06.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19512910 | [1998/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9622910 | Date: | 01.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0817742 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0817742 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B62H3/08 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
B62H3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/03] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM ABSTELLEN VON ZWEIRADFAHRZEUGEN | [1998/03] | English: | DEVICE FOR PARKING TWO-WHEELED VEHICLES | [1998/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR REMISER DES DEUX-ROUES | [1998/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/03] | 30.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.10.1997 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | 21.10.1997 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.10.1997 | M01   Fee paid on   05.11.1997 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 21.10.1998 | [2001/23] | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE70850 (TURNER) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2422526 (LAGUILLIER JEAN GEORGES [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4119403 (INST SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document * |