EP0802942 - BIOLOGICALLY DEGRADABLE POLYMERS, PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME AND THE USE THEREOF FOR PRODUCING BIODEGRADABLE MOULDED ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARZELHAN, Volker Südtiroler Ring 32 D-67273 Weisenheim / DE | 02 /
KRONER, Matthias Brucknerstrasse 25 D-67304 Eisenberg / DE | 03 /
HOFMANN, Jürgen Münschbuschweg 30c D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
SEELIGER, Ursula Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 20 D-67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
YAMAMOTO, Motonori Lassallestrasse 6 D-68199 Mannheim / DE | 06 /
BAUER, Peter Erich-Kästner-Strasse 13 D-67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1997/44] | Application number, filing date | 96900928.1 | 08.01.1996 | [1997/44] | WO1996EP00067 | Priority number, date | DE19951000756 | 13.01.1995 Original published format: DE 19500756 | [1997/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9621692 | Date: | 18.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0802942 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0802942 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/44 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
C08G69/48 (EP,US);
B65D65/466 (EP,US);
C08G69/44 (EP,US);
C08L3/02 (EP,US);
C08L2201/06 (EP,US);
C08L77/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L3/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/44] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE POLYMERE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG BIOABBAUBARER FORMKÖRPER | [1997/44] | English: | BIOLOGICALLY DEGRADABLE POLYMERS, PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME AND THE USE THEREOF FOR PRODUCING BIODEGRADABLE MOULDED ARTICLES | [1997/44] | French: | POLYMERES BIODEGRADABLES, LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTI LISATION POUR LA PRODUCTION DE CORPS MOULES BIODEGRADABLES | [1997/44] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 20.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.1999
WITHDRAWN EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY P.O. Box 511 Kingsport TN 37662-5075 / US Opponent's representative Evans, David Charles fJ CLEVELAND 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.1999
WITHDRAWN EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY P.O.Box 511 Kingsport, TN 37662-5075 / US Opponent's representative Evans, David Charles fJ CLEVELAND 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | 31.05.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.02.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 21.04.2003 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0561224 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0565235 (SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER [JP]); | [A]WO9213019 (DU PONT [US]) |