EP0873358 - CAPTURING OF MICROORGANISMS USING COMPLEMENT COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innogenetics N.V. Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7, Box 4 9052 Ghent / BE | For all designated states DELFT DIAGNOSTIC LABORATORY B.V. Reinier de Graafweg 7 NL- 2625 AD Delft / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states INNOGENETICS N.V. Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7, Box 4 B-9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | ||
For all designated states DELFT DIAGNOSTIC LABORATORY B.V. Reinier de Graafweg 7 NL- 2625 AD Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERBRINK, Paul Van Vegtenplantsoen 2 NL-2369 VK Koudenkerk a/d Rijn / NL | 02 /
VAN DEN MUNCKHOF, Henk Kroosvaren 9 NL-2631 DS Nootdorp / NL | 03 /
QUINT, Wilhelmus Populierenlaan 26 NL-2631 HX Nootdorp / NL | [1998/44] | Application number, filing date | 96901269.9 | 15.01.1996 | [1998/44] | WO1996EP00137 | Priority number, date | EP19950870004 | 13.01.1995 Original published format: EP 95870004 | [1998/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9621675 | Date: | 18.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0873358 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C07K17/00, C12N1/02, C12Q1/24, G01N33/569, G01N33/543 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
G01N33/54326 (EP);
C12Q1/24 (EP);
G01N33/569 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/44] | Title | German: | EINFANGEN VON MIKROORGANISMEN MITTELS KOMPLEMENT KOMPONENTEN | [1998/44] | English: | CAPTURING OF MICROORGANISMS USING COMPLEMENT COMPONENTS | [1998/44] | French: | CAPTURE DE MICRO-ORGANISMES A L'AIDE DE CONSTITUANTS DU COMPLEMENT | [1998/44] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.08.1997 | Examination requested [1998/44] | 04.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/15] | 12.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4693967 (B. J. GORMUS) [X] 1,2,9 * column A; claim - * [A] 3-8,10-19; | [XA]WO8702063 (IMMUNICON CORPORATION) [X] 1,2,9 * page 32; claims 1,8-11,22,26,32,35 * [A] 3-8,10-19; | [A]EP0605003 (VICAM, L. P.) [A] 1-19 * column W * |