EP0809435 - COMPOSITION CAPABLE OF RELEASING ACRALDEHYDE AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 45764 Marl / DE | ||
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states DEGUSSA AG Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WERLE, Peter Im Börner 43 D-63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 02 /
TRAGESER, Martin Schulstrasse 1 a D-63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 03 /
HELMLING, Oswald Wiesenstrasse 15 D-63594 Hasselroth / DE | 04 /
JAKOB, Harald Meerholzer Strasse 1 D-63594 Hasselroth / DE | [1997/49] | Application number, filing date | 96901342.4 | 01.02.1996 | [1997/49] | WO1996EP00415 | Priority number, date | DE1995105171 | 16.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19505171 | [1997/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9625040 | Date: | 22.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0809435 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0809435 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01N35/02, C02F1/50 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
C02F1/50 (EP);
C09K23/42 (EP,US);
A01N35/02 (EP);
C07C45/59 (EP);
C09K23/00 (EP);
C09K23/34 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/59, C07C47/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [1997/49] | Title | German: | ZUR ACROLEINFREISETZUNG BEFÄHIGTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [1997/49] | English: | COMPOSITION CAPABLE OF RELEASING ACRALDEHYDE AND ITS USE | [1997/49] | French: | COMPOSITION CAPABLE DE LIBERER DE L'ACROLEINE ET SON UTILISATION | [1997/49] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 29.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JPS4540054B [ ]; | [A]US3690857 (BLAIR CHARLES M JR) [A] 1-14* column 4, line 50 - line 53 *; | [A]GB2079153 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 15 - line 26 * * page 1, line 50 - line 62 *; | [Y]EP0066224 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 12 * * page 4, line 37 - page 5, line 5 * * page 5, line 11 *; | [DY]US4851583 (BOCKOWSKI EDMUND [US], et al) [DY] 1-14 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 28 * * column 4, line 62 - line 66 *; | [A]EP0493658 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [D]US5183944 (WERLE PETER [DE], et al); | [DA]DE4326575 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X] - T.OUCHI ET AL., "POLYMERIZATION OF DIALLYLIDENEPENTAERYTHRITOL. 7. COPOLYMERIZATION OF 2-VINYL-1,3-DIOXOLANE WITH MALEIC ANHYDRIDE", CAPLUS, Database accession no. 1970:510169, XP002004740 | [ ] - KAGAKU ZASSHI, (1970), vol. 73, no. 7, pages 1717 - 1719 | [X] - CAPLUS, Database accession no. 1971:112779, XP002004741 | [X] - "POLYMERIZATION OF CYCLIC ACETALS. I. POLYMERIZATION OF 2-VINYL-1,3-DIOXANE AND 2-ISOPROPENYL-1,3-DIOXANE", CAPLUS, Database accession no. 1969:4893 | [ ] - J. POLYM. SCI., (1968), vol. 6, no. 11, pages 3182 - 3184 |