EP0773025 - NEW STABLE GALENIC FORMULATIONS CONTAINING AN ACID-LABILE BENZIMIDAZOL COMPOUND, AND PRODUCTION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | Revocation of patent | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | 17.03.2006 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A. Av. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A. Av. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states ESTEVE QUIMICA, S.A. Avenida Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 12 08024 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALLESTER RODES, Montserrat Calle Marqués de Santa Ana, 14 E-08023 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
VAN BOVEN, Marinus Avenida 11 de setiembre, 22B E-08391 Tiana / ES | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/20] | SUGRANES - VERDONCES - FERREGÜELA Calle Provenza, 304 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 96901349.9 | 26.01.1996 | [1997/20] | WO1996ES00013 | Priority number, date | ES19950000181 | 01.02.1995 Original published format: ES 9500181 | [1997/20] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9623500 | Date: | 08.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773025 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773025 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 08.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44, A61K9/50 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/4439 (EP,FI,US);
A61K31/44 (FI);
A61K9/5073 (FI);
A61K9/5078 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/20] | Extension states | SI | 26.09.1996 | Title | German: | NEUE STABILE GALENISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN, DIE EINE SÄURELABILE BENZIMIDAZOLVERBINDUNG ENTHALTEN, UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1997/20] | English: | NEW STABLE GALENIC FORMULATIONS CONTAINING AN ACID-LABILE BENZIMIDAZOL COMPOUND, AND PRODUCTION PROCESS | [1997/20] | French: | NOUVELLES FORMULATIONS GALENIQUES STABLES COMPRENANT UN COMPOSE DE BENZIMIDAZOLE ACIDE-LABILE, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1997/20] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1996 | Translation filed | 17.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 23.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1999 | Observations by third parties | 08.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP99116334.6 / EP0993830 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.03.2001
19.11.2002
WITHDRAWN AstraZeneca AB c/o Global Intellectual Property, Patents 151 85 Södertälje / SE | 02
07.03.2001
15.03.2001
ADMISSIBLE ETHYPHARM 21, rue Saint-Matthieu B.P. 45 78550 HOUDAN / FR Opponent's representative Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.03.2001
19.11.2002
WITHDRAWN AstraZeneca AB c/o Global Intellectual Property, Patents 151 85 Södertälje / SE | ||
02
07.03.2001
15.03.2001
ADMISSIBLE ETHYPHARM 21, rue Saint-Matthieu B.P. 45 78550 HOUDAN / FR Opponent's representative Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [2001/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.03.2001
15.03.2001
ADMISSIBLE AstraZeneca AB c/o Global Intellectual Property, Patents 151 85 Södertälje / SE | ||
02
07.03.2001
15.03.2001
ADMISSIBLE ETHYPHARM 21, rue Saint-Matthieu B.P. 45 78550 HOUDAN / FR Opponent's representative Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [2001/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.03.2001
WITHDRAWN AstraZeneca AB c/o Global Intellectual Property, Patents 151 85 Södertälje / SE | ||
02
07.03.2001
ETHYPHARM 21, rue Saint-Matthieu B.P. 45 78550 HOUDAN / FR Opponent's representative Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 11.04.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.02.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.04.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.05.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.05.2003 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 14.02.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/18] | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 23.07.2003 | Appeal received No. T0629/03 | 10.09.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.02.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 27.05.2003 | Appeal received | 21.04.2005 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2005/17] | 14.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.02.2006 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0519365 (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-3 * * examples 1,2 * * column 3, line 4 - line 9 *; | [X]EP0519144 (ILSAN ILAC VE HAMMADDELERI SAN [TR]) [X] 1,2,5 * claims 1-5 * * page 2, line 39 - line 58 ** page 3, line 1 - line 26 * | Examination | US5045321 | - Handbook of Chemistry and Physics, 52nd Ed., 1971-1972, pp. B-106, B-107, B-150 | other | EP0247983 | EP0519144 | US5232706 | EP0646006 | WO9624338 | - "Sodium Lauryl Sulfate", Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, pages 448, XP000847697 |