EP0754712 - WATER-SOLUBLE POLYMER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND DETERGENT COMPOSITION COMPRISING WATER-SOLUBLE POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Shigeru 1111-306, Shiromidai 2-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670 / JP | 02 /
MAEDA, Yoshihiro A-201, Tiffany 21 416-1, Chuji Himeji-shi Hyogo 670 / JP | 03 /
NISHIBAYASHI, Hideyuki 403, Shirasagi-ryo 931-11 Hamada Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-12 / JP | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96901529.6 | 02.02.1996 | [1997/04] | WO1996JP00222 | Priority number, date | JP19950017044 | 03.02.1995 Original published format: JP 1704495 | JP19950018904 | 07.02.1995 Original published format: JP 1890495 | [1997/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9623822 | Date: | 08.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754712 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0754712 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08F283/06, C08L51/08, C11D3/37 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
C11D3/3757 (EP,US);
C08F283/02 (EP,US);
C08F283/06 (EP,US);
C11D3/3707 (EP,US);
C11D3/3715 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F283/06, C08F220/06 (US,EP);
C08F283/06, C08F222/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/04] | Title | German: | WASSERLÖSLICHES POLYMER, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND DETERGENTIENZUSAMMENSETZUNG DIE DIESES WASSERLÖSLICHES POLYMER ENTHALTEN | [1997/04] | English: | WATER-SOLUBLE POLYMER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND DETERGENT COMPOSITION COMPRISING WATER-SOLUBLE POLYMER | [1997/04] | French: | POLYMERE HYDROSOLUBLE, PROCEDE POUR LE PREPARER ET COMPOSITION DETERGENTE LE CONTENANT | [1997/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1996 | Translation filed | 25.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.1996 | Search fee paid | 25.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0639592 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [PX] 1-24 * page 2, line 34 - page 5, line 26 * | International search | [X]JPH0686503B ; | [X]JPH03177406 (ROHM & HAAS); | [X]JPH0479365B |