EP0807007 - SETTING TOOL FOR BLIND RIVET NUTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pietrzyk, Horst Königsallee 18h 14193 Berlin / DE | [1997/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Zellentin, Rüdiger Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Nigerstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Zellentin, Rüdiger Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Zweibrückenstrasse 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96901779.7 | 30.01.1996 | [1997/47] | WO1996EP00374 | Priority number, date | DE1995102855 | 30.01.1995 Original published format: DE 19502855 | [1997/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9623632 | Date: | 08.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0807007 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807007 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B25B27/00 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
B25B27/0014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/47] | Title | German: | SETZWERKZEUG FÜR BLINDNIETMUTTERN | [1997/47] | English: | SETTING TOOL FOR BLIND RIVET NUTS | [1997/47] | French: | OUTIL DE POSE D'ECROUS DE RIVETS BORGNES | [1997/47] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 23.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2069907 (WANER HARRY E) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE2009428 (AERPAT AG) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2150044 (FASTENERS LTD P S M) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2129467 (AVDEL LTD) [A] 3* figure 2 *; | [Y]FR2381936 (AERPAT AG [CH]) [Y] 1-4 * page 5, line 28 - line 34; figure 3 *; | [DYA]GB1554623 (AVIBANK MFG INC) [DY] 1,3 * the whole document * [A] 4; | [Y]US4321814 (MARTIN ALAN) [Y] 1,3 * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO8910238 (DARLINGTON & SONS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-4 * page 4, line 24 - line 27; figure 1 *; | [A]US5050420 (LIU YANG-TING [TW]) [A] 1,2 * figures 9,10 * |