EP0811053 - PROCESS AND COMPOSITION FOR CLEANING SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
IT
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNES, Howard, Anthony 55 Croft Avenue Bromborough Wirral Merseyside L62 2BN / GB | 02 /
GARVEY, Michael, Joseph The Hollies Nigel Road Heswall Wirral Merseyside L60 1XU / GB | 03 /
LEACH, Matthew, James 87 Holmville Road Bebington Wirral Merseyside L63 2PX / GB | 04 /
SHARPLES, Martin 101 Kings Lane Bebington Wirral Merseyside L63 5LZ / GB | 05 /
SMITH, Gillian 59 Coopers Gate The Village Banbury Oxford OX16 7EQ / GB | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Dekker, Enno Ernst Jan Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Dekker, Enno E.J. Unilever N.V. Patents Division P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1997/50] | Elliott, Peter William Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96901798.7 | 07.02.1996 | [1997/50] | WO1996EP00544 | Priority number, date | GB19950003595 | 23.02.1995 Original published format: GB 9503595 | GB19950014301 | 13.07.1995 Original published format: GB 9514301 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626263 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811053 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811053 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/04, C11D3/43, C11D3/30 | [1997/50] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN | [1998/21] | English: | PROCESS AND COMPOSITION FOR CLEANING SURFACES | [1997/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET COMPOSITION DE NETTOYAGE DE SURFACES | [1997/50] |
Former [1997/50] | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON OBERFLÄCHER | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 16.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0033601 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al)[A] 1,7; | [A]WO9111505 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * page 17, line 25 - line 30; example - *; | [A]EP0590722 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,2,4-7 * page 2, line 37 - line 39; example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0630965 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,7 * claim - * |