EP0802986 - METHODS OF DETERMINING ENDOGENOUS THROMBIN POTENTIAL (ETP) AND THROMBIN SUBSTRATES FOR USE IN SAID METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hemker, Hendrik Coenraad Tongersestraat 41 NL-6211 LM Maastricht / NL | [1997/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEMKER, Hendrik, Coenraad Tongersestraat 41 NL-6211 LM Maastricht / NL | 02 /
RIJKERS, Dirk, Thomas, Sigurd Arieslaan 13 NL-5632 AS Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
TESSER, Godefriedus, Ignatius Kronenburgersingel 64 NL-6511 AT Nijmegen / NL | [2001/38] |
Former [1997/44] | 01 /
HEMKER, Hendrik, Coenraad Tongersestraat 41 NL-6211 LM Maastricht / NL | ||
02 /
RIJKERS, Dirk, Thomas, Sigurd Arieslaan 13 NL-5632 AS Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
TESSER, Godefridus, Ignatius Kronenburgersingel 64 NL-6511 AT Nijmegen / NL | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 96902007.2 | 10.01.1996 | [1997/44] | WO1996NL00018 | Priority number, date | EP19950200043 | 10.01.1995 Original published format: EP 95200043 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9621740 | Date: | 18.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0802986 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0802986 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/56, C07K5/06, C07K5/08, C07K5/10 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
C07K5/0806 (EP,US);
C07K14/75 (EP,US);
C07K5/06026 (EP,US);
C07K5/06052 (EP,US);
C07K5/0812 (EP,US);
C07K5/0819 (EP,US);
C07K5/1021 (EP,US);
C12Q1/56 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS DES ENDOGENEN THROMBIN-POTENTIALS UND THROMBIN SUBSTRATE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DIESEN VERFAHREN | [1997/44] | English: | METHODS OF DETERMINING ENDOGENOUS THROMBIN POTENTIAL (ETP) AND THROMBIN SUBSTRATES FOR USE IN SAID METHODS | [1997/44] | French: | PROCEDES POUR LA DETERMINATION DU POTENTIEL THROMBINE ENDOGENE (ETP), ET SUBSTRATS POUR THROMBINE UTILISES DANS CES PROCEDES | [1997/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.1997 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Request for further processing for: | 18.11.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 18.11.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.1998 | 31.01.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.07.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0280610 (SERBIO [FR]) [DX] 13-18,23 * page 9, line 30; example 19; table 1 *; | [X]WO8601209 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 36,37,40 * page 3, line 12 - line 17 *; | [DA]EP0420332 (HEMKER HENDRIK COENRAAD [NL], et al) [DA] 1,36,37,40,41 * column W *; | [A]US4247454 (AF EKENSTAM BO T, et al) [A] 36,40,41 * column W *; | [A]US4214049 (AF EKENSTAM BO T [SE], et al) [A] 42,44,45 * column W *; | [DA] - H.C. HEMKER ET AL., "Continuous registration of thrombin generation in plasma, its use for the determination of the thrombin potential", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, STUTTGART DE, (1993), vol. 70, no. 4, pages 617 - 624, XP000567560 [DA] 1,13 * the whole document * | [PX] - D.T. RIJKERS ET AL., "Design and synthesis of thrombin substrates with modified kinetic parameters", THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, WASHINGTON US, (19950915), vol. 79, no. 5-6, pages 491 - 499, XP002000556 [PX] 1-45 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0049-3848(95)00139-I | [PX] - H.C. HEMKER ET AL., "Thrombin generation in plasma: its assessment via the endogenous thrombin potential", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, STUTTGART DE, (199507), vol. 74, no. 1, pages 134 - 138, XP000195941 [PX] 1-24,45 * the whole document * |