EP0871494 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING TUMOR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENTA INCORPORATED 3550 General Atomics Court San Diego California 92121 / US | For all designated states Morrison, Richard S. 19125 N.E. 51st Street Redmond, WA 98053 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states GENTA INCORPORATED 3550 General Atomics Court San Diego, California 92121 / US | ||
For all designated states Morrison, Richard S. 19125 N.E. 51st Street Redmond, WA 98053 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRISON, Richard S. 19125 N.E. 51st Street Redmond, WA 98053 / US | 02 /
TSENG, Ben Y. 13255 Capstone Drive San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
BROWN, Bob D. 445 N. Willow Spring Drive Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96902124.5 | 11.01.1996 | [1998/43] | WO1996US00331 | Priority number, date | US19950371001 | 10.01.1995 Original published format: US 371001 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9621471 | Date: | 18.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871494 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.07.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C12N15/11 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
C12N15/1138 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/111 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/43] | A61K48/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/43] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND METHODEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TUMORZELLEN | [1998/43] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING TUMOR CELLS | [1998/43] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES CELLULES TUMORALES | [1998/43] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.1997 | Search fee paid | 08.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.08.1997 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 20.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.1999 | 31.01.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2000 | 31.01.2010 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9415945 (TEXAS BIOTECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,16 * page 8 - page 11 * * claim - * [Y] 1,2,5-8,16,17,19-22,27,28; | [DXY] - MORRISON RICHARD S ET AL, "Fibroblast growth factor receptor gene expression and immunoreactivity are elevated in human glioblastoma multiforme", CANCER RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 54, no. 10, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2794 - 2799, XP001189418 [DX] 1,20,27,28 * abstract * * page 2798, column R * [Y] 1,2,5-8,16,17,19-22,27,28 | [DX] - BECKER DOROTHEA ET AL, "Inhibition of the fibroblast growth factor receptor 1 (FGFR-1) gene in human melanocytes and malignant melanomas leads to inhibition of proliferation and signs indicative of differentiation", ONCOGENE, (1992), vol. 7, no. 11, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 2303 - 2313, XP008030210 [DX] 1,2,5,6,8,16,20-22 * the whole document * | [DA] - YAMAGUCHI F ET AL, "Differential expression of two fibroblast growth factor-receptor genes is associated with malignant progression in human astrocytomas", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (199401), vol. 91, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 484 - 488, XP002141422 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.2.484 | International search | [Y]WO9500528 (PHARMAGENICS INC [US]) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, Supplement 0, Volume 18, Part A, issued January 1994, NOBLE, "Steps on the Path to Precursor Cell transplantation for Tissue Repair", page 219, Abstract DZ018. | [Y] - JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, Supplement O, Volume 17E, MORISHITA et al., "Enhanced Effectiveness of Antisense Oligonucleotides in Vascular Smooth Muscle Cells (VSMC) by HVJ Mediated Gene Transfer", page 239, Abstract SZ318. | [Y] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, Volume 266, Number 2, issued 15 January 1991, MORRISON, "Suppression of Basic Fibroblast Growth Factor Expression by Antisense Oligodeoxynucleotides Inhibits the Growth of Transformed Human Astrocytes", pages 728-734. | [Y] - CANCER RESEARCH, Volume 50, issued 15 April 1990, MORRISON et al., "Basic Fibroblast Growth Factor-Like Activity and Receptors are Expressed in a Human Glioma Cell Line", pages 2524-2529. |