EP0812131 - BISCUIT ROLL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [1997/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAURI, Jürg Schulstrasse 34 CH-4132 Muttenz / CH | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Alain 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | [1997/51] | Application number, filing date | 96902201.1 | 22.02.1996 | [1997/51] | WO1996CH00056 | Priority number, date | EP19950102840 | 28.02.1995 Original published format: EP 95102840 | [1997/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626644 | Date: | 06.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0812131 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812131 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A21D13/00, A21D13/08, A21D10/02 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
A21D10/025 (EP);
A21D13/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/51] | Extension states | SI | 29.09.1997 | Title | German: | GEROLLTES ROULADENBISCUIT | [1997/51] | English: | BISCUIT ROLL | [1997/51] | French: | BISCUIT ROULE | [1997/51] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 16.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 05.01.2000 | FR | 05.01.2000 | GB | 05.01.2000 | GR | 05.01.2000 | IE | 05.01.2000 | IT | 05.01.2000 | NL | 05.01.2000 | SE | 05.01.2000 | LU | 22.02.2000 | BE | 28.02.2000 | DK | 05.04.2000 | PT | 05.04.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/29] | ES | 05.01.2000 | |
FR | 05.01.2000 | ||
GB | 05.01.2000 | ||
GR | 05.01.2000 | ||
IE | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
LU | 22.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
Former [2004/35] | ES | 05.01.2000 | |
FR | 05.01.2000 | ||
GB | 05.01.2000 | ||
GR | 05.01.2000 | ||
IE | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | ES | 05.01.2000 | |
GB | 05.01.2000 | ||
GR | 05.01.2000 | ||
IE | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | ES | 05.01.2000 | |
GB | 05.01.2000 | ||
IE | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | ES | 05.01.2000 | |
GB | 05.01.2000 | ||
IE | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | ES | 05.01.2000 | |
GB | 05.01.2000 | ||
IE | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | GB | 05.01.2000 | |
IE | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | GB | 05.01.2000 | |
IE | 05.01.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | GB | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | GB | 05.01.2000 | |
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3934040 (SMERAK LOUIS J, et al) [Y] 1,5-8,10 * claim - *; | [A]EP0158590 (THOMI FRANCK AG [CH]) [A] 10-14* figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4664932 (YAMAGUCHI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * claim - *; | [A]FR2643546 (LOSTANLEN AUGUSTE [FR]) [A] 9-14 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y] - ED: J. ILLSLEY, Good Housekeeping New Step-by-step cook book., LONDON, UK., EBURY PRESS, XP002003639 [Y] 1,5-8,10 * page 394, column 2, line 14 - page 395, line 9 * |