EP0811233 - CIRCUIT FOR DRIVING A CONTACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STREICH, Bernhard Asamstrasse 1 D-92224 Amberg / DE | [1997/50] | Application number, filing date | 96902228.4 | 12.02.1996 | [1997/50] | WO1996DE00221 | Priority number, date | DE1995203146U | 24.02.1995 Original published format: DE 29503146 U | [1997/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626528 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811233 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811233 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01H47/10 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
H01H47/10 (EP,US);
H01H47/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1997/50] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINES SCHÜTZES | [1997/50] | English: | CIRCUIT FOR DRIVING A CONTACTOR | [1997/50] | French: | CIRCUIT DE PILOTAGE POUR UN CONTACTEUR-DISJONCTEUR | [1997/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 22.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.08.1998 | [2008/06] | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4998177 (TAKIZAWA KOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 59; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB2170931 (FORD MOTOR CO) [Y] 1-4 * page 2, line 51 - line 75; figure 1 *; | [PX]DE29503146U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PX] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9409759U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | DE4321252 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |