EP0807178 - MYCOBACTERIAL PROTEINS, MICROORGANISMS PRODUCING SAME AND USES OF SAID PROTEINS IN VACCINES AND FOR DETECTING TUBERCULOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | [2004/23] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 28, rue du Docteur Roux F-75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAQUEYRERIE, Anne 83, avenue de Breteuil F-75015 Paris / FR | 02 /
MARCHAL, Gilles 4, rue Francisco-Ferrer F-94200 Ivry-sur-Seine / FR | 03 /
PESCHER, Pascale 124, rue Damrémont F-75018 Paris / FR | 04 /
ROMAIN, Félix 49bis, rue C.F.-Dreyfus Bel-Air F-91640 Fontenay-les-Briis / FR | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96902319.1 | 31.01.1996 | [1997/47] | WO1996FR00166 | Priority number, date | US19950382184 | 01.02.1995 Original published format: US 382184 | [1997/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9623885 | Date: | 08.08.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0807178 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807178 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C07K14/35, G01N33/53, C12N15/62, C07K16/12, A61K39/04 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
C07K14/35 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/47] | Title | German: | MYKROBAKTERIELLE PROTEINE, MIKROORGANISMEN WELCHE DIESE PRODUZIEREN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS IMPFSTOFF UND ZUM NACHWEIS VON ZUBERKULOSE | [1997/47] | English: | MYCOBACTERIAL PROTEINS, MICROORGANISMS PRODUCING SAME AND USES OF SAID PROTEINS IN VACCINES AND FOR DETECTING TUBERCULOSIS | [1997/47] | French: | PROTEINES DE MYCOBACTERIES, MICROORGANISMES LES PRODUISANT ET LEURS UTILISATIONS VACCINALES ET POUR LA DETECTION DE LA TUBERCULOSE | [1997/47] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 23.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX] - LAQUEYRERIE A. ET AL., "Cloning, sequencing, and expression of the apa gene coding for the Mycobacterium tuberculosis 45/47-kilodalton secreted antigen complex", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, WASHINGTON US, (199510), vol. 63, no. 10, pages 4003 - 4010, XP002001489 [PX] 1-18 * the whole document * | [DX] - ROMAIN F. ET AL., "Identification of a Mycobacterium bovis BCG 45/47-kilodalton antigen complex, an immunodominant target for antibody response after immunization with living bacteria", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, WASHINGTON US, (199302), vol. 61, no. 2, pages 742 - 750, XP002001490 [DX] 1,2,8-10,12-18 * the whole document * | [DY] - WIELES B. ET AL., "Characterization of a Mycobacterium leprae antigen related to the secreted Mycobacterium tuberculosis protein MPT32", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, WASHINGTON US, (199401), vol. 62, no. 1, pages 252 - 258, XP002001491 [DY] 1,2,8-10,12-18 * the whole document * | [Y] - CRISTINA M. ET AL., "Purification, characterization, gene sequence, and significance of a bacterioferritin from Mycobacterium leprae", J. EXP. MED., (199407), vol. 180, pages 319 - 327, XP000568830 [Y] 1,2,8-10,12-18 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.180.1.319 |