EP0872899 - NONWOVEN FABRIC FOR AN ALKALINE BATTERY SEPARATOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS, LTD. 4-2, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [2011/12] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS, LTD. 4-2, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIGEMATSU, Toshihiro, Mitsubishi Paper Mills Ltd. 3-4-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Yoshitami, Mitsubishi Paper Mills Ltd. 3-4-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 03 /
OKU, Yasuyuki, Mitsubishi Paper Mills Ltd. 3-4-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/44] | Kraus, Walter, Dr. Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/43] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96902448.8 | 16.02.1996 | [1998/43] | WO1996JP00333 | Priority number, date | JP19950029387 | 17.02.1995 Original published format: JP 2938795 | JP19950062937 | 22.03.1995 Original published format: JP 6293795 | JP19960008208 | 22.01.1996 Original published format: JP 820896 | [1998/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9625771 | Date: | 22.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872899 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0872899 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16, D04H1/46, D04H1/54, D06M10/02 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
D04H1/44 (EP,US);
H01M50/44 (EP,US);
D04H1/4291 (EP,US);
D04H1/43828 (EP,US);
D04H1/4383 (EP,US);
D04H1/43832 (EP,US);
D04H1/43835 (EP,US);
D04H1/492 (EP,US);
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H3/11 (EP,US);
D06M10/025 (EP,US);
D21H13/14 (EP,US);
H01M50/417 (EP,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,US);
H01M50/491 (EP,US);
D06M2101/18 (EP,US);
D06M2101/24 (EP,US);
D21H25/005 (EP,US);
D21H25/04 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0014 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1998/43] | H01M2/16, D04H3/00, D04H3/10, D06M10/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/43] | Title | German: | VLIES FÜR SEPARATOR EINER ALKALIBATTERIE UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1998/43] | English: | NONWOVEN FABRIC FOR AN ALKALINE BATTERY SEPARATOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [1998/43] | French: | TISSU NON-TISSE POUR SEPARATEUR D'ACCUMULATEUR ALCALIN ET METHODE DE PRODUCTION DE CELUI-CI | [1998/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.1997 | Translation filed | 07.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.1997 | Search fee paid | 07.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.08.1997 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 12.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 02.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.03.2011 | [2012/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0321237 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1,3,10 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0795916 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [E] 1,3,10,16,21* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS6112960 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH0434057 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]JPH06251760 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [Y]JPH06295715 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [XP]JPH07142047 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [AP]JPH07153441 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) |