Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0804141
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.06.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
15.12.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] |
01.09.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
23.05.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.01.2000 |
First examination report |
|
12.01.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.01.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.02.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.09.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.11.1997 [1997/45] |
19.09.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.11.1997 [1997/45] |
11.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.04.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|