Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10512568 | Global Dossier | 02.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US37545795 | 20.01.1995 | US9600295 | 05.01.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU713104B | Global Dossier | 25.11.1999 | B2 | AU4696396 | 07.08.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US37545795 | 20.01.1995 | US9600295 | 05.01.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0804141 | Global Dossier | 05.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37545795 | 20.01.1995 | US9600295 | 05.01.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9607157 | 11.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US37545795 | 20.01.1995 | US9600295 | 05.01.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9705408 | 29.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US37545795 | 20.01.1995 | US9600295 | 05.01.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9622074 | Global Dossier | 25.07.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37545795 | 20.01.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2210089 | 25.07.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37545795 | 20.01.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1169110 | 31.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US37545795 | 20.01.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR19980701519 | 15.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US37545795 | 20.01.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5624666 | 29.04.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US37545795 | 20.01.1995 |