EP0807141 - PROCESS FOR MODIFYING SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Cardiovascular Systems Corporation 2101 Cottontail Lane Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | [2000/16] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIRVIO, Lary, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
SWENSON, Barbara, C. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96902662.4 | 16.01.1996 | [1997/47] | WO1996US00436 | Priority number, date | US19950381754 | 01.02.1995 Original published format: US 381754 | [1997/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9623835 | Date: | 08.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0807141 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807141 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, A61L33/00 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
A61L33/0029 (EP,US);
A61L33/0094 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J2479/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN | [1997/47] | English: | PROCESS FOR MODIFYING SURFACES | [1997/47] | French: | PROCEDE POUR MODIFIER DES SURFACES | [1997/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 21.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 14.07.1999 | [2002/27] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0086187 (IRD BIOMATERIAL AB [SE]) [A] 1 * claims 16,22,23,25,30-33 *; | [A]EP0124676 (IRD BIOMATERIAL AB [SE]) [A] 1 * claims 16,22,23,25,30-33 *; | [A]WO9105817 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]) [A] 1* claims 1,6-9 * |