EP0804412 - HYDROCYANATION OF DIOLEFINS AND ISOMERIZATION OF NONCONJUGATED 2-ALKYL-3-MONOALKENENITRILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOO, Thomas Apartment 2-A-3, 402 Foulk Road Wilmington, DE 19803-3836 / US | 02 /
GARNER, James, Michael Apartment 3, 815 North Jackson Street Wilmington, DE 19806-4651 / US | 03 /
SHAPIRO, Rafael 1415 Fresno Road Wilmington, DE 19803-5121 / US | 04 /
TAM, Wilson 3781 Brookcroft Lane Boothwyn, PA 19061-1817 / US | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96902689.7 | 17.01.1996 | [1997/45] | WO1996US00548 | Priority number, date | US19950379429 | 27.01.1995 Original published format: US 379429 | US19950563718 | 28.11.1995 Original published format: US 563718 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9622968 | Date: | 01.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0804412 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0804412 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C253/10, C07C255/07, C07F9/6574, C07F9/145, B01J31/18, C07F9/146, C07F9/24 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
C07F9/65746 (EP,US);
B01J31/185 (EP,US);
C07C253/10 (EP,US);
C07F9/1411 (EP,US);
C07F9/1412 (EP,US);
C07F9/145 (EP,US);
C07F9/146 (EP,US);
C07F9/242 (EP,US);
C07F9/65517 (EP,US);
C07F9/65744 (EP,US);
B01J2231/323 (EP,US);
B01J2231/52 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C253/10, C07C255/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/45] | Title | German: | CYANWASSERSTOFF ADDITION AN DIOLEFINE UND ISOMERISIERUNG VON NICHT KONJUGIERTEN 2-LKYL-3-MONOALKENNITRILEN | [1997/45] | English: | HYDROCYANATION OF DIOLEFINS AND ISOMERIZATION OF NONCONJUGATED 2-ALKYL-3-MONOALKENENITRILES | [1997/45] | French: | HYDROCYANATION DE DIOLEFINES ET ISOMERISATION DE 2-ALKYL-3-MONOALCENENITRILES NON CONJUGUES | [1997/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 19.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98203601.4 / EP0911339 | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2934564 (BURG ANTON B, et al) [A] 47,48 * column 2, line 14 - line 52; examples XIV-XVIII *; | [X]EP0005500 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 49,50 * example 1 *; | [AD]WO9303839 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [AD] 1,15,42,43 * page 7, line 2 - line 13; examples 42-44; claim - *; | [A]US5288918 (MAHER JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 42 * see formula V and VI, column 11, tables *; | [AD] - M. J. BAKER ET AL., "Chelating diphosphite complexes of nickel(0) and platinum(0): Their remarkable stability and hydrocyanation activity", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, LETCHWORTH GB, (1991), pages 803 - 4, XP002002591 [AD] 1,15,42,43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c39910000803 | [A] - M. J. BARKER ET AL., "Chiral aryl diphosphites: a new class of ligands for hydrocyanation catalysis", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, LETCHWORTH GB, (1991), pages 1292 - 3, XP002002592 [A] 1,15,42,43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C39910001292 | [A] - G. MÄRKL ET AL., "Zur Chemie des Cyclooctatetraenyldilithiums", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, LAUSANNE CH, (1984), vol. 273, pages 1 - 29, XP002002593 [A] 49,50 * page 24, line 26 - line 33 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-328X(84)80503-3 | [A] - ZH. M. IVANOVA, "Phosphoramidous Difluorides", J. GEN. CHEM. USSR (ENGL. TRANSL.), (1965), vol. 35, pages 165 - 7, XP000570216 [A] 49 * page 166, paragraph L * | [A] - J. HEINICKE ET AL., "1,3-Carbanionische Umlagerungen, Synthese von Bis(o-hydroxyaryl)-Phosphorverbindungen", PHOSPHORUS, SULFUR SILICON RELAT. ELEM., (1989), vol. 44, no. 3-4, pages 209 - 16, XP000570204 [A] 49 * page 212, column L, line 20 - line 23; example 1H * |