EP0808235 - VARIABLE DIAMETER CUTTER ROLLER OR GLUE SPREADING ROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windmöller & Hölscher Münsterstrasse 50 D-49525 Lengerich / DE | [1997/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEIER, Heinz Torfdamm 15 D-49549 Ladbergen / DE | 02 /
FELD, Karl-Heinz Bahnhofstrasse 182 D-49525 Lengerich / DE | 03 /
KUCKHERMANN, Gustav Schulstrasse 11 D-33647 Bielefeld / DE | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K. Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96902946.1 | 30.01.1996 | [1997/48] | WO1996EP00372 | Priority number, date | DE1995104162 | 08.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19504162 | [1997/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9624471 | Date: | 15.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0808235 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808235 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/26 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
B26D7/2628 (EP,US);
B26D7/26 (KR);
B26D7/2614 (EP,US);
B26D2210/11 (EP,US);
Y10T156/15 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4708 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/48] | Title | German: | IN IHREM DURCHMESSER VERÄNDERBARE MESSER- ODER LEIMAUFTRAGSWALZE | [1997/48] | English: | VARIABLE DIAMETER CUTTER ROLLER OR GLUE SPREADING ROLLER | [1997/48] | French: | ROULEAU PORTE-LAMES OU APPLICATEUR DE COLLE A DIAMETRE VARIABLE | [1997/48] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 24.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013086 (NOYES BAKER WEBSTER) [A] 1 * page 3, column R, line 24 - line 40; figure 2 *; | [A]US3635440 (GOMPEL JAMES J VAN) [A] 1,2 * column 7, line 36 - column 8, line 7; figures 12,13 *; | [Y]US3825196 (YAMAZAKI S) [Y] 1-4,8-10,15 * column 2, line 37 - line 43 * * column 2, line 61 - line 65; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4872382 (BENNER JR HAROLD T [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,8-10,15 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, line 49 - line 53 * * column 3, line 11 - line 48 * * column 4, line 16 - line 26; figures 3,4,6,7 *; | [A]EP0364864 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0559077 (FRANKENTHAL AG ALBERT [DE]); | [A]WO9319904 (GOEBEL GMBH MASCHF [DE], et al); | [AP]EP0664208 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]) [AP] 1* claim 1 * |