EP0808278 - METHOD FOR MAKING CONTAINERS SUCH AS BOTTLES HAVING A SELF-STABILISING BASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIDEL 55, rue du Pont VI F- 76053 Le Havre Cedex / FR | [1997/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESOUTTER, Luc 95, rue du Maréchal-Joffre F-76600 Le Havre / FR | 02 /
FEUILLOLEY, Guy 35, rue de Sainte-Adresse F-76600 Le Havre / FR | 03 /
OUTREMAN, Jean-Tristan Hameau Rimbertot Cauville F-76930 Octeville-sur-Mer / FR | 04 /
LA BARRE, Paul 15, rue des Guêpes F-76310 Sainte-Adresse / FR | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Gorrée, Jean-Michel Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Gorrée, Jean-Michel Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1997/48] | Gorrée, Jean-Michel Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96903057.6 | 06.02.1996 | [1997/48] | WO1996FR00194 | Priority number, date | FR19950001507 | 09.02.1995 Original published format: FR 9501507 | [1997/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9624525 | Date: | 15.08.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0808278 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808278 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/02 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
B65D1/0276 (EP,US);
B65D1/02 (KR);
B29C49/18 (EP,US);
B29C49/642 (EP,US);
B29C49/6472 (EP,US);
B29C2049/78645 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BEHÄLTERN ,WIE FLASCHEN, MIT SELBSTTRAGENDEM BODEN | [1997/48] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING CONTAINERS SUCH AS BOTTLES HAVING A SELF-STABILISING BASE | [1997/48] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION DE RECIPIENTS, TELS QUE BOUTEILLES, A FOND AUTOSTABLE | [1997/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 23.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 23.09.1998 | ES | 08.02.1999 | [2004/37] |
Former [2001/23] | GR | 23.09.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2429157 (CARNAUD TOTAL INTERPLASTIC [FR]) [A] 3,18 * page 2, line 12 - line 41; figure -; claims 1-6 *; | [Y]FR2508004 (KATASHI AOKI [JP]) [Y] 1-12,17,19,22 * page 4, line 25 - page 8, line 32 * * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 3 * * page 13, line 2 - page 14, line 24; figure - *; | [DA]FR2595294 (SIDEL SA [FR]) [DA] 1,9,10* the whole document *; | [A]US4892205 (POWERS THOMAS F [US], et al) [A] 11,16 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 42; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO9006263 (HOECHST CELANESE PLASTICS LTD [GB]) [A] 13,17,19-21 * page 3, line 6 - line 28; figure 1 *; | [A]US5047271 (FEDDERSEN FREDERICK J [US], et al) [A] 14,20,21 * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 11; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]EP0559103 (NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12,17,19,22 * column 2, line 49 - column 5, line 13 * * column 6, line 9 - column 7, line 39 * * column 8, line 34 - column 10, line 15 * * column 10, line 54 - column 11, line 46; figures 1-7 * |