EP0811042 - PRESSURE-SENSITIVE CRAYON ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANDEN, Neil, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
FRANK, John, W. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
HAGER, Patrick, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96903350.5 | 11.01.1996 | [1997/50] | WO1996US00097 | Priority number, date | US19950394653 | 22.02.1995 Original published format: US 394653 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626249 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811042 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811042 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C09D13/00, C09J5/00, C09J133/06 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
C09J9/005 (EP,US);
C09J133/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1997/50] | Title | German: | DRUCKEMPFINDLICHES KLEBEMITTEL FÜR KLEBESTIFTE | [1999/36] | English: | PRESSURE-SENSITIVE CRAYON ADHESIVE | [1997/50] | French: | BATON DE COLLE AUTOCOLLANTE | [1997/50] |
Former [1997/50] | DRUCKEMPFINDLICHES KLEBMITTEL FÜR SCHREIBKREIDEN | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 18.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 09.07.2003 | LI | 09.07.2003 | [2004/22] | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO9513331 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [PX] 1,2,4-9 * page 27, line 26 - page 28, line 8 *; | [A]JPS5190622 (PENTEL KK) [A] 10 * claim 1 * |