EP0811071 - AMPLIFIER SEQUENCES DERIVED FROM THE DESMIN GENE, VECTORS COMPRISING SAME AND USES THEREOF FOR PRODUCING PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | For all designated states UNIVERSITE PARIS VII 2, Place Jussieu F-75251 Paris Cedex 05 / FR | [2002/03] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 28, rue du Docteur Roux F-75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE PARIS VII 2, Place Jussieu F-75251 Paris Cedex 05 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAULIN, Denise 7, rue de Montreuil F-94300 Vincennes / FR | 02 /
LI, Zhen, Lin 56,avenue Victor Cresson 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | [1998/10] |
Former [1997/50] | 01 /
PAULIN, Denise 7, rue de Montreuil F-94300 Vincennes / FR | ||
02 /
LI, Zhen, Lin 33, rue Mazarine F-75005 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96904158.1 | 16.02.1996 | [1997/50] | WO1996FR00261 | Priority number, date | FR19950001937 | 20.02.1995 Original published format: FR 9501937 | [1997/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626284 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811071 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811071 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/85, C12N15/67, A61K31/70, C12N1/21, // (C12N15/11, 15:12),(C12N1/21, C12R1:19) | [1997/50] | CPC: |
C12N15/67 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N15/85 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/50] | Title | German: | VOM DESMINGEN ABSTAMMENDE AMPLIFIZIERUNGSSEQUENZEN, VEKTOREN, DIE DIESE ENTHALTEN UND ANWENDUNGEN DERSELBEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PROTEINEN | [1997/50] | English: | AMPLIFIER SEQUENCES DERIVED FROM THE DESMIN GENE, VECTORS COMPRISING SAME AND USES THEREOF FOR PRODUCING PROTEINS | [1997/50] | French: | SEQUENCES AMPLIFICATRICES DERIVEES DU GENE DE LA DESMINE, VECTEURS PORTANT CES SEQUENCES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PROTEINES | [1997/50] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - LI, H. ET AL., "An E box in the desmin promoter cooperates with the E box and MEF-2 sites of a distal enhancer to direct muscle -specific transcription.", EMBO (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY ORGANIZATION) JOURNAL 13 (15). 3580-3589, (19940801), XP002006941 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [DA] - LI, Z. ET AL., "DIFFERENT FACTORS INTERACT WITH MYOBLAST -SPECIFIC AND MYOTUBE -SPECIFIC ENHANCER REGIONS OF THE HUMAN DESMIN GENE.", J BIOL CHEM 268 (14). 1993. 10403-10415, XP002006942 [DA] 1-19 * the whole document * | [A] - LI, H. ET AL., "REGULATION OF THE MOUSE DESMIN GENE TRANSACTIVATION BY MYOD MYOGENIN MRF4 AND MYF5.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES 21 (2). 1993. 335-343, XP002006943 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [DA] - LI, Z. ET AL., "DESMIN SEQUENCE ELEMENTS REGULATING SKELETAL MUSCLE -SPECIFIC EXPRESSION IN TRANSGENIC MICE.", DEVELOPMENT (CAMB) 117 (3). 1993. 947-959, XP000574732 [DA] 1-19 * the whole document * |