EP0758787 - ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION FOR DRIVING ELECTROLYTIC CAPACITOR AND ELECTROLYTIC CAPACITOR MADE THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIIBO, Nario 21-206, Myokenzaka 6-chome Katano-shi Osaka 576 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Naoko Kohri-so C-105, 9-3, Nasuzukuri 1-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka 573 / JP | 03 /
TAKAMUKU, Yoshinori Amenity Daigo 311, 21-2, Daigo Nakayama-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-13 / JP | [1997/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96904278.7 | 29.02.1996 | [1997/08] | WO1996JP00473 | Priority number, date | JP19950042892 | 02.03.1995 Original published format: JP 4289295 | [1997/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9627201 | Date: | 06.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758787 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758787 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.09.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/035 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
H01G9/022 (EP,US);
H01G9/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/08] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYT LÖSUNG FÜR ELEKTROLYT KONDENSATOREN UND DIESE ENTHALTENDER KONDENSATOR | [2006/20] | English: | ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION FOR DRIVING ELECTROLYTIC CAPACITOR AND ELECTROLYTIC CAPACITOR MADE THEREWITH | [1997/08] | French: | SOLUTION D'ELECTROLYTE SERVANT A COMMANDER UN CONDENSATEUR ELECTROLYTIQUE ET CONDENSATEUR ELECTROLYTIQUE AINSI REALISE | [1997/08] |
Former [1997/08] | ELEKTROLYTISCHE LÖSUNG FÜR ELEKTROLYTISCHE KONDENSATOREN UND DIESE ENTHALTENDER KONDENSATOR | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.1996 | Translation filed | 20.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.1996 | Search fee paid | 20.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 28.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02312218 ; | [A]JPH0374827 ; | [A]EP0591810 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4* page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 9 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910313), vol. 015, no. 106, Database accession no. (E - 1044), & JP02312218 A 19901227 (NICHICON CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910620), vol. 015, no. 240, Database accession no. (E - 1079), & JP03074827 A 19910329 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH02312218 (NICHICON CORP); | [A]JPH0374827 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |