EP0755226 - ASSEMBLY FOR SEALING A PUNCTURE IN A VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | Refusal of application | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Jude Medical Puerto Rico B.V. Drentestraat 20 1083 HK Amsterdam / NL | [2002/15] |
Former [1997/05] | For all designated states SHERWOOD MEDICAL COMPANY 1915 Olive Street St. Louis, Missouri 63103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNAM, Peter, Henry 64 The Boulevard Worthing West Sussex BN13 1LA / GB | 02 /
ALLISON, Richard, Dale 22622 N.E. 195th Street Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers 4, Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 96904591.3 | 05.02.1996 | [1997/05] | WO1996US01719 | Priority number, date | US19950389839 | 10.02.1995 Original published format: US 389839 | [1997/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9624290 | Date: | 15.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755226 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [1997/05] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/05] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN EINES GEFÄSSDURCHBOHRUNG | [1997/15] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR SEALING A PUNCTURE IN A VESSEL | [1997/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OBTURATION D'UNE PERFORATION DANS UN VAISSEAU SANGUIN | [1997/05] |
Former [1997/05] | Anordnung zum Verschliessen eines Gefässdurchbohrung | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.1996 | Search fee paid | 25.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 18.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/41] | 12.05.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.04.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5021059 (KENSEY KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1-4,16 * abstract * * column 6, line 12 - column 7, line 3 * * column 8, lines 1-14 * * column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 11 * [Y] 5,7-10; | [Y]WO9222252 (ASHRIDGE AG [CH]) [Y] 5,7-10 * page 7, lines 5-37; figure - *; | [A]US5312435 (NASH JOHN [US], et al) [A] * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4890612 (KENSEY KENNETH [US]); | [XP]US5413571 (KATSAROS GEORGES [US], et al); | [YP]US5433481 (CORBISHLEY THOMAS S [GB]) | by applicant | US1191736 | US1794221 | US4606337 | US4744364 | US4852568 | US4890612 | WO9014796 | US5053046 | US5108421 |