EP0812187 - SOLID NANOPARTICULATE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/51] | REDISPERSIBLE NANOPARTICULATE FILM MATRICES WITH PROTECTIVE OVERCOATS | ||
[2002/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elan Pharma International Limited WIL House Shannon, Co. Clare / IE | [1999/28] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states NanoSystems L.L.C. 1250 South Collegeville Road, Bldg. 1 Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESIENO, Mark, A. 1225 Roberts Road Gilbertsville, PA 19525 / US | 02 /
STETSKO, Gregg 10255 Science Center Road San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich, Dr., et al Dörries, Frank-Molnia & Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/35] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman Postfach 22 16 61 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/01] | Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/51] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96904612.7 | 09.02.1996 | [1997/51] | WO1996US01845 | Priority number, date | US19950387651 | 13.02.1995 Original published format: US 387651 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9625150 | Date: | 22.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0812187 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812187 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
A61K9/1676 (EP,US);
A61K9/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/51] | Title | German: | FESTE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS NANOPARTIKELN | [2002/33] | English: | SOLID NANOPARTICULATE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION | [2002/33] | French: | COMPOSITION SOLIDE DE NANOPARTICULES PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2002/33] |
Former [1997/51] | REDISPERGIERBARE NANOPARTIKELFILMMATRIZEN MIT SCHÜTZENDER DECKSCHICHT | ||
Former [1997/51] | REDISPERSIBLE NANOPARTICULATE FILM MATRICES WITH PROTECTIVE OVERCOATS | ||
Former [1997/51] | MATRICES EN COUCHE MINCE DE NANOPARTICULES REDISPERSIBLES A ENROBAGE PROTECTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 14.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2003 | BE | 02.05.2003 | CH | 02.05.2003 | LI | 02.05.2003 | NL | 02.05.2003 | DK | 02.08.2003 | GR | 02.08.2003 | SE | 02.08.2003 | PT | 04.08.2003 | ES | 13.08.2003 | [2004/28] |
Former [2004/23] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
CH | 02.05.2003 | ||
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
CH | 02.05.2003 | ||
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 02.05.2003 | |
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 02.05.2003 | |
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 02.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0164967 (STERWIN AG [CH]) [X] 1-17 * claims 1,2,4-9,11 * * page 7, line 7 - page 8, line 7 * * page 9; example 2 *; | [X]EP0514967 (STERLING WINTHROP INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-17 * claims 1,11 * * page 4, line 7 - line 10 ** page 4, line 36 - line 47 * |