blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0812524

EP0812524 - SPLIT CAVITY MICROWAVE OVEN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
2000 M-63
Benton Harbor
Michigan 49022 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/51]For all designated states
WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
2000 M-63
Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GUSTAFSSON, Conny
c/o Whirlpool Europe s.r.l., Patent Dept.
V.le G. Borghi 27, 21025 Comerio / IT
[1997/51]
Representative(s)Guerci, Alessandro
Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A.
Patent Department
Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1997/51]Guerci, Alessandro
Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
Application number, filing date96905808.027.02.1996
[1997/51]
WO1996EP00799
Priority number, dateSE1995000073628.02.1995         Original published format: SE 9500736
[1997/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9627274
Date:06.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0812524
Date:17.12.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0812524
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.09.1996
ClassificationIPC:H05B6/80, F24C7/08
[1997/51]
CPC:
H05B6/6441 (EP,US); H05B6/64 (EP,KR,US); F24C7/087 (EP,US);
H05B6/6414 (EP,US); H05B6/6452 (EP,US); H05B6/808 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1997/51]
TitleGerman:MIKROWELLENHERD MIT GETEILTEM OFENRAUM[1999/18]
English:SPLIT CAVITY MICROWAVE OVEN[1997/51]
French:FOUR A MICRO-ONDES A CAVITE DIVISEE[1997/51]
Former [1997/51]MIKROWELLENHERD MIT GETEILTEM OFENRAUN
Entry into regional phase15.09.1997National basic fee paid 
15.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/51]
12.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.1999Fee for grant paid
05.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]DE1097594  (THERMA AG);
 [X]US3943319  (HIRAI KAZUMI, et al) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9003719  (CORE CONSULTING GROUP [GB]);
 [A]US5147068  (WRIGHT CHRISTOPHER B [US]) [A] 1,6 * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0548697  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]);
 [A]GB2266039  (FRAZER DESIGN CONSULTANTS LTD [GB]);
 [A]WO9408459  (PATENTSMITH CORP [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.