EP0852977 - POWDER HAVING MULTILAYER FILM ON ITS SURFACE AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTETSU MINING CO., LTD. 3-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states Nakatsuka, Katsuto 3-5-1403, Moniwadai 4-chome Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi- Miyagi 982-0252 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | For all designated states NITTETSU MINING CO., LTD. 3-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nakatsuka, Katsuto 3-5-1403, Moniwadai 4-chome, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi- Miyagi 982-02 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKATSUKA, Katsuto 3-5-1403, Moniwadai 4-chome, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 982-02 / JP | 02 /
ATARASHI, Takafumi, Nittetsu Mining Co., Ltd. 2-1, Hirai-aza-Hakeshita, Hinode-machi Nishitama-gun, Tokyo 190-01 / JP | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96906004.5 | 13.03.1996 | [1998/29] | WO1996JP00628 | Priority number, date | JP19950080832 | 14.03.1995 Original published format: JP 8083295 | [1998/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9628269 | Date: | 19.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852977 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0852977 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.09.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/02, C03C17/34, C09D11/00, C23C18/00, C23C18/52, G03G9/083, G03G9/087, C09C1/00, C09C3/06, C09D5/36 | [1999/07] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C09D5/36 (EP,US);
B22F1/16 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/18 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/3417 (EP,US);
C09C1/0081 (EP,US);
C09C3/063 (EP,US);
C09C3/066 (EP,US);
G03G9/0832 (EP,US);
G03G9/0834 (EP,US);
G03G9/0837 (EP,US);
G03G9/0839 (EP,US);
H01F1/061 (EP,US);
H01F1/24 (EP,US);
C01P2002/84 (EP,US);
C01P2004/10 (EP,US);
C01P2004/12 (EP,US);
C01P2004/20 (EP,US);
C01P2004/32 (EP,US);
C01P2004/39 (EP,US);
C01P2004/40 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/29] | B22F1/02, C03C17/34, C09D11/00, C23C18/00, C23C18/52, G03G9/083, G03G9/087 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/29] | Title | German: | PULVER MIT MEHRSCHICHTIGEN FILMEN AUF DER OBERFLÄCHE UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1998/29] | English: | POWDER HAVING MULTILAYER FILM ON ITS SURFACE AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME | [1998/29] | French: | POUDRE A PELLICULE MULTICOUCHE SUR SA SURFACE ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1998/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1997 | Translation filed | 09.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1997 | Search fee paid | 09.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 17.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03103865 ; | [A]EP0328906 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7-9 * page 5, line 11 - line 30 * * example - * * claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910730), vol. 015, no. 300, Database accession no. (P - 1232), & JP03103865 A 19910430 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS5931003 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [A]JPH04269804 (NITTETSU MINING CO LTD); | [A]JPH06228604 (NITTETSU MINING CO LTD) | Examination | DE4104310 | EP0609897 |