blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0815000

EP0815000 - ROAD PADS FOR TRACKED VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
William Cook Cast Products Limited
Parkway Avenue, Sheffield
South Yorkshire S9 4UL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/02]For all designated states
William Cook Cast Products Limited
Parkway Avenue
Sheffield, South Yorkshire S9 4UL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BAKER, Peter, Edward
15 Balmer Hill
Gainford, County Durham D12 3EJ / GB
[1998/02]
Representative(s)Tunstall, Christopher Stephen
Harrison Goddard Foote
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield
S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/02]Tunstall, Christopher Stephen
Dibb Lupton Alsop, Fountain Precinct
Balm Green, Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB
Application number, filing date96907552.215.03.1996
[1998/02]
WO1996GB00625
Priority number, dateGB1995000551518.03.1995         Original published format: GB 9505515
[1998/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9629234
Date:26.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0815000
Date:07.01.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0815000
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.1996
ClassificationIPC:B62D55/275
[1998/02]
CPC:
B62D55/275 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/02]
TitleGerman:GLEISKETTENPOLSTER FÜR KETTENFAHRZEUGE[1998/02]
English:ROAD PADS FOR TRACKED VEHICLES[1998/02]
French:AMORTISSEUR POUR CHENILLES DE VEHICULES[1998/02]
Entry into regional phase17.10.1997National basic fee paid 
17.10.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
20.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.1999Fee for grant paid
21.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL19.01.2000
IE15.03.2000
LU15.03.2000
MC30.09.2000
[2007/29]
Former [2003/18]NL19.01.2000
IE15.03.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/17]NL19.01.2000
IE15.03.2000
MC31.03.2000
Former [2003/09]NL19.01.2000
IE15.03.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2001/50]IE15.03.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2001/24]MC30.09.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]US3973807  (KORNER OTTO, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 3 - line 56; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE3909043  (MAK MASCHINENBAU KRUPP [DE]) [A] 1* column 2, line 54 - page 3, line 1; figures 5,6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.