EP0768750 - SWITCHED-RELUCTANCE ROTARY MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKKISO CO., LTD. No. 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0013 / JP | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-0042 / JP | For all designated states SEIKO SEIKI Co., Ltd. 3-1 Yashiki 4-chome Narashino-shi Chiba 275-0004 / JP | For all designated states Chiba, Akira Ochiai Mansion 707/1-8-14, Shimo-Ochiai Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-0033 / JP | For all designated states Fukao, Tadashi 24-45, Matsukaze-dai, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 227-0067 / JP | For all designated states Michioka, Chikara Villaminami 1-305, 25-2, Izumi-cho Takarazuka-shi Hyogo 665-0864 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states NIKKISO CO., LTD. No. 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0013 / JP | ||
For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-0042 / JP | |||
For all designated states SEIKO SEIKI Co., Ltd. 3-1 Yashiki 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba 275-0004 / JP | |||
For all designated states Chiba, Akira Ochiai Mansion 707/1-8-14, Shimo-Ochiai Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 161-0033 / JP | |||
For all designated states Fukao, Tadashi 24-45, Matsukaze-dai, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 227-0067 / JP | |||
For all designated states Michioka, Chikara Villaminami 1-305, 25-2, Izumi-cho Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0864 / JP | |||
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states NIKKISO CO., LTD. No. 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 / JP | ||
For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo, 144 / JP | |||
For all designated states SEIKO SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-1, Yashiki 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba 275 / JP | |||
For all designated states Chiba, Akira Ochiai Mansion 707/1-8-14, Shimo-Ochiai Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 161 / JP | |||
For all designated states Fukao, Tadashi 24-45, Matsukaze-dai, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 227 / JP | |||
For all designated states Michioka, Chikara Haitsu Hatano-dai 909/2-8-21, Hatano-dai Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 142 / JP | |||
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states NIKKISO CO., LTD. No. 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 / JP | ||
For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo, 144 / JP | |||
For all designated states SEIKO SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-1, Yashiki 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba 275 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIBA, Akira, Ochiai Mansion 707 1-8-14, Shimo-ochiai, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161 / JP | 02 /
FUKAO, Tadashi 24-45, Matsukaze-dai, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 227 / JP | 03 /
MICHIOKA, Chikara Villaminami 1-305, 25-2,Izumi-cho Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0864 / JP | [2001/48] |
Former [1997/16] | 01 /
CHIBA, Akira, Ochiai Mansion 707 1-8-14, Shimo-ochiai, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161 / JP | ||
02 /
FUKAO, Tadashi 24-45, Matsukaze-dai, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 227 / JP | |||
03 /
MICHIOKA, Chikara, Haitsu Hatano-dai 909 2-8-21, Hatano-dai, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142 / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96907720.5 | 29.03.1996 | [1997/16] | WO1996JP00860 | Priority number, date | JP19950073760 | 30.03.1995 Original published format: JP 7376095 | [1997/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9635257 | Date: | 07.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0768750 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0768750 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.11.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/00, H02P5/00, H02P7/05, H02K7/09 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
H02P25/08 (EP,US);
F16C32/0444 (EP,US);
F16C32/0497 (EP,US);
H02K19/103 (EP,US);
H02K7/09 (EP,US);
H02K3/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/16] | H02P7/00, H02P5/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI [1997/16] | Title | German: | GESCHALTETE RELUKTIONS-ROTATIONSMASCHINE | [1997/16] | English: | SWITCHED-RELUCTANCE ROTARY MACHINE | [1997/16] | French: | MACHINE ROTATIVE A RELUCTANCE COMMUTEE | [1997/16] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1996 | Translation filed | 29.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 29.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 26.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Request for further processing for: | 13.11.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.11.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 12.06.2002 | [2003/20] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0453179 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0444203 (SEKOH GIKEN KK [JP]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | International search | [YP]JPH0884491 (EBARA CORP); | [Y]JPH04236188 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH0322845 (SECOH GIKEN KK); | [A]JPH02142385 (SECOH GIKEN KK); | [A]JPH07508157 ; | [A]JPH04229093 (SHINETORON CORP) |