EP0817826 - LOW-VISCOSITY OPACIFYING AGENT CONCENTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [1999/44] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMÖLLER, Guido Benrodestrasse 47 D-40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
WADLE, Armin Am Jägersteig 8 D-40724 Hilden / DE | 03 /
ANSMANN, Achim Kirchberg 25 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | 04 /
TESMANN, Holger Unter den Linden 23 D-41363 Jüchen / DE | 05 /
FÖRSTER, Thomas Adalbert-Stifter-Strasse 15 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | [1998/03] | Application number, filing date | 96908084.5 | 20.03.1996 | [1998/03] | WO1996EP01197 | Priority number, date | DE1995111572 | 29.03.1995 Original published format: DE 19511572 | [1998/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9630476 | Date: | 03.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0817826 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0817826 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/825, C11D1/835, B01F17/00, A61K7/50 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/604 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
C07H15/04 (EP,US);
C09K23/017 (EP,US);
C09K23/018 (EP,US);
C11D1/835 (EP,US);
C11D3/0089 (EP,US);
C11D3/18 (EP,US);
C11D1/525 (EP,US);
C11D1/662 (EP,US);
C11D1/667 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT [1998/03] | Title | German: | NIEDRIGVISKOSE TRÜBUNGSMITTELKONZENTRATE | [1998/03] | English: | LOW-VISCOSITY OPACIFYING AGENT CONCENTRATES | [1998/03] | French: | CONCENTRES D'AGENTS OPACIFIANTS DE FAIBLE VISCOSITE | [1998/03] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/03] | 03.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4767617 (SHANSKY ALBERT [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 21 - line 28 *; | [A]EP0510870 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * claims 1,3,5 *; | [A]JPH0617088 ; | [A]US4623471 (WILSBERG HEINZ-MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 4, line 55 - line 67 * * column 6; examples 5-8 *; | [A]WO9424248 (HENKEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 1 - line 3 * * page 2, line 37 - line 40 * * page 4, line 7 - line 9; claim 1 * * page 7, line 15 - line 18 *; | [A]EP0569843 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940421), vol. 018, no. 222, Database accession no. (C - 1193), & JP06017088 A 19940125 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |