EP0813707 - A COMPUTER SYSTEM WITH UNATTENDED ON-DEMAND AVAILABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOU, Stephen, T. 16235 N.W. Schendel Avenue, No. B Beaverton, OR 97006 / US | 02 /
FENGER, Russell, J. 20514 S.W. Rosa Drive Aloha, OR 97007 / US | 03 /
KUMAR, Mohan, J. 1765 N.W. 173, No. 711 Beaverton, OR 97006 / US | 04 /
LORTZ, Victor, B. 7716 S.W. Oviatt Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | 05 /
MANNY, Benjamin, L. 2010 N.W. 135th Avenue Portland, OR 97229 / US | 06 /
TRAVNICEK, Mil 17619 N.W. Waltuck Court Portland, OR 97129 / US | 07 /
WANG, Chih-Kan 1522 N.W. 129th Place Portland, OR 97229 / US | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 96908571.1 | 29.02.1996 | [1997/52] | WO1996US02742 | Priority number, date | US19950400027 | 06.03.1995 Original published format: US 400027 | [1997/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9627827 | Date: | 12.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0813707 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0813707 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/30, G06F1/32 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
G06F1/3265 (EP,US);
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F1/3209 (EP,US);
G06F11/1441 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/52] | Title | German: | EIN RECHNERSYSTEM MIT UNBEWACHTER AUF-ANFRAGE-VERFÜGBARKEIT | [1997/52] | English: | A COMPUTER SYSTEM WITH UNATTENDED ON-DEMAND AVAILABILITY | [1997/52] | French: | SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE AUTOMATIQUEMENT DISPONIBLE SUR DEMANDE | [1997/52] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.1997 | Search fee paid | 01.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/52] | 03.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59133620 ; | [X]EP0635778 (IBM [US]) [X] 4-6* page 5, line 50 - line 58; figure 4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841205), vol. 008, no. 265, Database accession no. (P - 318), & JP59133620 A 19840801 (FUJITSU KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4521847 (ZIEHM RICHARD T [US], et al); | [X]US4648031 (JENNER EARLE H [US]); | [A]US5151987 (ABRAHAM ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]US5363505 (MASLAK BARBARA A M [US], et al); | [X]US5375247 (HUESER KLAUS [DE]); | [XP]US5423045 (KANNAN KRISHNAMURTHI [US], et al); | [AE]US5519874 (YAMAGISHI JUNKO [JP], et al); | [XE]US5524241 (GHONEIMY ADEL [US], et al) |